This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/19/2020 at 17:28:26 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jose Ignacio Tapia

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jose Ignacio Tapia. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1220

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Tapia, Jose Ignacio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Silveira, Nicole A.

Bakich, Donna

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

03/12/2019: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

03/13/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/27/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC148.9(a): False Identification To Peace Officer; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Tapia, Jose Ignacio; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Tapia, Jose Ignacio; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Tapia, Jose Ignacio; Deputy Public Defender: McInally, Nicholas Bernard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Tapia, Jose Ignacio; Charge #: 001; Description: PC148.9(a): False Identification To Peace Officer; Statute: 148.9(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bakich, Donna

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silveira, Nicole A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Egan, Gerad Denis