This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/22/2021 at 11:44:23 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jose Herrera

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jose Herrera. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3631

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Herrera, Jose Luis Osio

Herrera, Jose Luis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Colby, Travis

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Roland, Tracy Marie

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Howard, Sean

Green, Anthony C

Galeon, Erica Joy

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

06/18/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

06/18/2020: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

06/24/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/15/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/29/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/12/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/26/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Collection Statement

11/09/2020: Collection Statement

Affidavit of Probation Violation

12/18/2020: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

12/30/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Returned Mail

02/23/2021: Returned Mail

Criminal: Minute Order

03/02/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/05/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Collection Statement

03/10/2021: Collection Statement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 004; VOP #1 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketProbation is revoked; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Original Type: Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Herrera, Jose Luis Osio; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Roland, Tracy Marie; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DispositionAmended Probation with Program; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Probation with Program; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 07/29/2020; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 180 Days; Comment: Count 1, Felony; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 07/29/2020; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 07/29/2023; Status; Status: Active; Date: 07/29/2020; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 12/30/2020; Comment: FTA; Programs; BTP: 52 Week Class; Ordered; Party: Herrera, Jose Luis Osio; Order Date: 07/29/2020; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Herrera, Jose Luis Osio; Deputy Public Defender: Howard, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC591.5: Damage/Obstruct Use-Wireless Comm Device; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Herrera, Jose Luis Osio; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Herrera, Jose Luis Osio; Charge #: 003; Description: PC591.5: Damage/Obstruct Use-Wireless Comm Device; Statute: 591.5; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Herrera, Jose Luis Osio; Charge #: 002; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Herrera, Jose Luis Osio; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenthal, Sara R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colby, Travis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colacito, Anthony Michael