This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/01/2020 at 00:24:42 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jose Gomez

Case Summary

On 05/26/2017 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jose Gomez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Shaver, Donald. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3017

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Shaver, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Gomez, Jose Alfredo Rosales

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph

Defendant Attorneys

Samrao, Ramnik S

Merced County Public Defender

 

Court Documents

Correspondence

11/18/2019: Correspondence

Revised FTP 2nd Courtesy Notice

05/06/2019: Revised FTP 2nd Courtesy Notice

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

01/30/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

07/17/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/13/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/19/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

06/07/2017: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Complaint

05/26/2017: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • FinancialGomez, Jose Alfredo Rosales; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Addt'l Collection Notice add Civil Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketFailure to Comply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Gomez, Jose Alfredo Rosales; Charge #: 004; Description: PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketFailure to Comply; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • FinancialGomez, Jose Alfredo Rosales; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Gomez, Jose Alfredo Rosales; Charge #: 003; Description: VC23222(a): Possession of Open Container - Driver; Statute: 23222(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Gomez, Jose Alfredo Rosales; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23546(a): Prior Convictions Within 10 Years Of Offense; Statute: 23546(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Gomez, Jose Alfredo Rosales; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23556(b)(3)(4): Blood Alcohol in Excess of 0.20; Statute: 23556(b)(3)(4); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Gomez, Jose Alfredo Rosales; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Gomez, Jose Alfredo Rosales; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23546(a): Prior Convictions Within 10 Years Of Offense; Statute: 23546(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Gomez, Jose Alfredo Rosales; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23556(b)(3)(4): Blood Alcohol in Excess of 0.20; Statute: 23556(b)(3)(4); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Gomez, Jose Alfredo Rosales; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph