This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/26/2020 at 12:35:57 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jose Castro

Case Summary

On 08/15/2016 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jose Castro. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Lo, Paul, Jacobs, Harry and Dougherty, Frank. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2189

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Lo, Paul

Jacobs, Harry

Dougherty, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Castro, Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colby, Travis

Compton, Misty

McConney, Adam D

Rosenthal, Sara R

Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn

Creeger, Matthew L

Silva, Michael

Defendant Attorney

Falasco, Dominic J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/07/2015: Complaint

Declaration

06/01/2015: Declaration

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • FinancialCastro, Jose; Transaction Assessment; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DispositionSentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC415(1): Disturbing The Peace - Fighting; Sentence; Fee Totals; $220.00; Fee Totals; $220.00; Comment; Comment: (Pay in full by 09-02-2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC415(1): Disturbing The Peace - Fighting; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 002; PC647(f): Disorderly Conduct:Under Infl Drug/Alcohol; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC415(1): Disturbing The Peace - Fighting; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • FinancialCastro, Jose; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn; Defendant: Castro, Jose; Contract Public Defender: Falasco, Dominic J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketProof; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketProof; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn; Defendant; Contract Public Defender: Falasco, Dominic J.

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2015
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Castro, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC242: Battery; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC647(f): Disorderly Conduct:Under Infl Drug/Alcohol; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketCustody Status; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketTime Not Waived; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketArraigned: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Castro, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketRelease: O/R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Castro, Jose; Charge #: 002; Description: PC647(f): Disorderly Conduct:Under Infl Drug/Alcohol; Statute: 647(f); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Castro, Jose; Charge #: 001; Description: PC415(1): Disturbing The Peace - Fighting; Statute: 415(1); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McConney, Adam D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silva, Michael Joe