Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/23/2021 at 00:32:25 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. John Muir, Junior

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against John Muir, Junior. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5272

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Muir, John Edward, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Lozano, Angelica

Asdorian, Blake M

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Galeon, Erica Joy

Green, Anthony C

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/13/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/06/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/30/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/29/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

09/25/2020: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/25/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/22/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

09/04/2020: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Complaint

08/26/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DispositionAmended Probation with Program; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Probation with Program; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 09/25/2020; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 5 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 5 Days; Comment: Count 1, Misd.; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 09/25/2020; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 09/25/2023; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/25/2020; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/29/2020; Comment: FTA; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 01/13/2021; Programs; BTP: 52 Week Class; Ordered; Party: Muir, John Edward, Junior; Order Date: 09/25/2020; Comment: to enroll within 30 days of release from custody

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Original Type: Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Muir, John Edward, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Original Type: Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Lozano, Angelica; Defendant: Muir, John Edward, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant: Muir, John Edward, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 09/25/2020; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 5 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 5 Days; Comment: Count 1, Misd.; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 09/25/2020; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 09/25/2023; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/25/2020; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/29/2020; Comment: FTA; Programs; BTP: 52 Week Class; Ordered; Party: Muir, John Edward, Junior; Order Date: 09/25/2020; Enroll by Date: 10/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCharges and Direct Consequence of Plea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Muir, John Edward, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Galeon, Erica Joy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Muir, John Edward, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Muir, John Edward, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Galeon, Erica Joy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony Charles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent