This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 01/29/2022 at 00:07:12 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jesus Ramirez

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jesus Ramirez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Foster, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5301

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Ramirez, Jesus

GonzalezRamirez, Jesus

Gonzalez Ramirez, Jesus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Her, Lee

Defendant Attorney

Page, Kathleen Coleen

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/26/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

11/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2022
  • FinancialGonzalez Ramirez, Jesus; AB177 Court & County Fees Reduction; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2022
  • DocketCourt & County Fee Adjustment Pursuant to AB177

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialGonzalez Ramirez, Jesus; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMonthly Payment Plan Setup with $45 Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 11/08/2021; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 30 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 12 Days; Conduct Credit: 12 Days; Comment: Count 1- Misd; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 11/08/2021; Term: 1 Year; End Date: 11/07/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 11/08/2021; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; $150.00; Fee Totals; $220.00; Comment; Comment: ($25.00 a month beginning on 1/1/2022 and due the 1st of each month thereafter until paid in full)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialGonzalez Ramirez, Jesus; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCourt Found Plea Knowledgeable; Intelligently Made Voluntary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront And Cross Examine Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCharges and Direct Consequence of Plea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Her, Lee; Defendant: Ramirez, Jesus; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Ramirez, Jesus; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez Ramirez, Jesus; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Her, Lee