Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/21/2020 at 14:00:44 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jesse Howard

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jesse Howard. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Breen, Thomas P., Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1-03

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Breen, Thomas P.

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Howard, Jesse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Colby, Travis

Gates, Kathryn

Margain, Andre Carlos

Defendant Attorneys

Howard, Sean

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/28/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/31/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/17/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/06/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/13/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/24/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/21/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

06/10/2019: Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Original Type: Violation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Howard, Jesse; Deputy Public Defender: Howard, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Howard, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Breen, Thomas P.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Howard, Jesse; Deputy Public Defender: Howard, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Howard, Jesse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Howard, Jesse; Deputy Public Defender: Howard, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWalk-In; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Howard, Jesse; Deputy Public Defender: Howard, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Howard, Jesse; Deputy Public Defender: Howard, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: PRCS; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Howard, Jesse; Deputy Public Defender: Howard, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Howard, Jesse; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: PRCS; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Howard, Jesse; Charge #: 001; Description: PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Statute: 3455(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard, Sean

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent