This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 15:33:58 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jason Young

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jason Young. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacobs, Harry and Dougherty, Frank. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2338

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jacobs, Harry

Dougherty, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Young, Jason Wayne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Creeger, Matthew L

Defendant Attorney

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/29/2015: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketCustody Status; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Young, Jason Wayne; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketCustody Status; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketGeneral Time Waived; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Young, Jason Wayne; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketGeneral Time Waived; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketCustody Status; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Young, Jason Wayne; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketGeneral Time Waived; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketCustody Status; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketCustody Status; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketGeneral Time Waived; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Young, Jason Wayne; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377(a): Possession Of A Controlled Substance; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketCustody Status; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketGeneral Time Waived; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketArraigned: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Young, Jason Wayne; Deputy Public Defender: Boortz, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Young, Jason Wayne; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11377(a): Possession Of A Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less