This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 20:48:36 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jason Timoteo

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jason Timoteo. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, McCabe, Brian and Moranda, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5520

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

McCabe, Brian

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Timoteo, Jason Dickie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McReynolds, Stacey Alyn

Pfeiff, Thomas M

Colby, Travis

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Page, Kathleen Coleen

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

11/15/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

11/15/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

11/19/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/10/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/22/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Collection Statement

12/27/2021: Collection Statement

Criminal: Minute Order

01/19/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketProhibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirearms Relinquishment Hearing; Original Type: Firearms Relinquishment Hearing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCourt Collections Order of Referral for Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialTimoteo, Jason Dickie; Transaction Assessment; $710.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DispositionSentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 12/22/2021; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 364 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 44 Days; Conduct Credit: 44 Days; Comment: Count 1, Felony. The Court has no objection to the defendant applying for Electronic Monitor.; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 12/22/2021; Term: 2 Years; End Date: 12/21/2023; Status; Status: Active; Date: 12/22/2021; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 002; PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 003; VC14601.1(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-Not Driving Ability; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialTimoteo, Jason Dickie; Transaction Assessment; $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Timoteo, Jason Dickie; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Pfeiff, Thomas M; Defendant: Timoteo, Jason Dickie; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; VC14601.1(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-Not Driving Ability; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McReynolds, Stacey Alyn; Defendant: Timoteo, Jason Dickie; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Timoteo, Jason Dickie; Charge #: 003; Description: VC14601.1(a): Drive Suspended/Revoked-Not Driving Ability; Statute: 14601.1(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Timoteo, Jason Dickie; Charge #: 002; Description: PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Statute: 30305(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Timoteo, Jason Dickie; Charge #: 001; Description: PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, Kathleen Coleen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael