This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/12/2020 at 17:52:08 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Isaias Mares Hernandez

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Isaias Mares Hernandez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Breen, Thomas P. and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6463

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Breen, Thomas P.

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Hernandez, Isaias

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McAfee, Michael

Colby, Travis

Defendant Attorneys

Howard, Sean

Berger, Richard

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

12/12/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

12/12/2018: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

12/19/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/26/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Collection Statement

12/27/2018: Collection Statement

Criminal: Minute Order

01/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/23/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • FinancialHernandez, Isaias; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2020-03924; Hernandez, Isaias; $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • FinancialHernandez, Isaias; Mail Payment; Receipt # LB-2020-03586; Hernandez, Isaias; $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • FinancialHernandez, Isaias; Mail Payment; Receipt # LB-2020-03349; Hernandez, Isaias; $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • FinancialHernandez, Isaias; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2020-02344; Hernandez, Isaias; $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialHernandez, Isaias; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2020-01137; Hernandez, Isaias; $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialHernandez, Isaias; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2020-00076; Hernandez, Isaias; $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialHernandez, Isaias; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2019-12440; Hernandez, Isaias; $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • FinancialHernandez, Isaias; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2019-11433; Hernandez, Isaias; $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • FinancialHernandez, Isaias; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2019-10056; Hernandez, Isaias; $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • FinancialHernandez, Isaias; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2019-08793; Hernandez, Isaias; $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Hernandez, Isaias; Deputy Public Defender: Howard, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Breen, Thomas P.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Hernandez, Isaias; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Breen, Thomas P.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC20001(b)(1): Hit and Run Driving Resulting in Injury to Another Person; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; VC23153(a): DUI of Alcohol with Bodily Injury; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; VC12500(a): Unlawful to Drive Unless Licensed; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McAfee, Michael; Defendant: Hernandez, Isaias; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Hernandez, Isaias; Charge #: 004; Description: VC12500(a): Unlawful to Drive Unless Licensed; Statute: 12500(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Hernandez, Isaias; Charge #: 003; Description: VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Statute: 2800.2; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Hernandez, Isaias; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23153(a): DUI of Alcohol with Bodily Injury; Statute: 23153(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Hernandez, Isaias; Charge #: 001; Description: VC20001(b)(1): Hit and Run Driving Resulting in Injury to Another Person; Statute: 20001(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard, Sean

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berger, Richard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent