This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/05/2021 at 18:02:02 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Humberto Martinez

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Humberto Martinez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2783

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Martinez, Humberto Alonso

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colby, Travis

Nored, Thane

Pfeiff, Thomas M

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Green, Anthony Charles

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Collection Statement

08/16/2021: Collection Statement

Criminal: Minute Order

08/13/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/30/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/14/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

07/07/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

07/07/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProhibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirearms Relinquishment Hearing; Original Type: Firearms Relinquishment Hearing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • FinancialMartinez, Humberto Alonso; Transaction Assessment; $710.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Probation; Charge Number: 001; PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 08/13/2021; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 9 Months; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 43 Days; Conduct Credit: 42 Days; Comment: Count 1, Felony.; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 08/13/2021; Term: 2 Years; End Date: 08/12/2023; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/13/2021; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 001; PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Admits; Charge Number: 002; HS11364: Possession of paraphernalia for controlled substance; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; No Contest; Charge Number: 001; PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • FinancialMartinez, Humberto Alonso; Transaction Assessment; $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Martinez, Humberto Alonso; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Pfeiff, Thomas M; Defendant: Martinez, Humberto Alonso; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Denied; Charge Number: 002; HS11364: Possession of paraphernalia for controlled substance; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Martinez, Humberto Alonso; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Humberto Alonso; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11364: Possession of paraphernalia for controlled substance; Statute: 11364; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Humberto Alonso; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Statute: 12022(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Humberto Alonso; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Statute: 422; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony Charles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent