This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/21/2020 at 22:16:07 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Howard Haunga

Case Summary

On 01/20/2016 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Howard Haunga. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacobs, Harry and Dougherty, Frank. The case status is Other .
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0358

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jacobs, Harry

Dougherty, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Haunga, Howard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McConney, Adam D

Colby, Travis

Defendant Attorneys

Green, Anthony

Public Defender, Deputy

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/20/2016: Complaint

Fingerprint Card

02/03/2016: Fingerprint Card

Order

03/02/2016: Order

Monthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

03/04/2016: Monthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

02/11/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Revised FTP 2nd Courtesy Notice

06/13/2019: Revised FTP 2nd Courtesy Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • FinancialHaunga, Howard; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Addt'l Collection Notice add Civil Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • FinancialHaunga, Howard; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2017-11790; Haunga, Howard; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • FinancialHaunga, Howard; Mail Payment; Receipt # LB-2017-03287; Haunga, Howard; $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • FinancialHaunga, Howard; Mail Payment; Receipt # LB-2016-14769; Haunga, Howard; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • FinancialHaunga, Howard; Mail Payment; Receipt # LB-2016-12390; Haunga, Howard; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • FinancialHaunga, Howard; Mail Payment; Receipt # LB-2016-10774; Haunga, Howard; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • FinancialHaunga, Howard; Mail Payment; Receipt # LB-2016-08593; Lila Faounuku; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • FinancialHaunga, Howard; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2016-06825; Lila Faounuku; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Haunga, Howard; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFingerprint Card; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Haunga, Howard; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McConney, Adam D; Defendant: Haunga, Howard; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273d(a): Corporal Punishment/Inflict Injury Upon Child; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC1170.12: Prior Strike (ENHANCEMENT); Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Haunga, Howard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Haunga, Howard; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1170.12: Prior Strike (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Haunga, Howard; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273d(a): Corporal Punishment/Inflict Injury Upon Child; Statute: 273d(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berger, Richard