This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/05/2021 at 18:01:20 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Hector Cisio

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Hector Cisio. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2780

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Cisio, Hector Villagrana

Villagrana, Hector

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Pfeiff, Thomas M

Colby, Travis

Nored, Thane

Defendant Attorneys

Noguera, Michael Anthony

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Monthly Payment Plan Setup with $45 Fee

08/10/2021: Monthly Payment Plan Setup with $45 Fee

Release Order

08/06/2021: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/06/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/14/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

07/07/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

07/07/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 08/06/2021; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 72 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 36 Days; Conduct Credit: 36 Days; Comment: Count 1, Misdemeanor time served; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 08/06/2021; Term: 1 Year; End Date: 08/06/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/06/2021; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 08/27/2021; Comment: FTA; Fee Totals; $220.00; Fee Totals; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Cisio, Hector Villagrana; Charge #: 003; Description: PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProhibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProbation is revoked; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirearms Relinquishment Hearing; Original Type: Firearms Relinquishment Hearing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • FinancialCisio, Hector Villagrana; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMonthly Payment Plan Setup with $45 Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 08/06/2021; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 72 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 36 Days; Conduct Credit: 36 Days; Comment: Count 1, Misdemeanor time served; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 08/06/2021; Term: 1 Year; End Date: 08/05/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/06/2021; Fee Totals; $220.00; Fee Totals; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 001; PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Stricken; Charge Number: 002; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Stricken

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Villagrana, Hector; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Cisio, Hector Villagrana; Charge #: 002; Description: PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1203(e)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Cisio, Hector Villagrana; Charge #: 002; Description: PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Statute: 422; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Cisio, Hector Villagrana; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1203(e)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Cisio, Hector Villagrana; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nored, Thane

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pfeiff, Thomas M