This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/23/2020 at 19:23:49 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Gregorio Esquivel Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Gregorio Esquivel Gonzalez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Schechter, Jeanne and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5586

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Schechter, Jeanne

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Gonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heil, Austin Brooke

Colby, Travis

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Lee, Beth A

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

10/04/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

10/04/2019: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

10/11/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Fingerprint Card

10/11/2019: Fingerprint Card

Criminal: Minute Order

10/16/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Information

10/25/2019: Information

Criminal: Minute Order

10/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Abstract of Judgment

11/26/2019: Abstract of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DispositionPrison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; **VC2800.4: Driving Wrong Direc While Fleeing Peace Off; Prison; Charge Number: 004; **VC23152(b)/23550.5(a):Driving Under Infl. w 0.08% or more/within Ten Years Prior Felony DUI; Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 11/19/2019; Term Type: Upper; Term: 3 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 49 Days; Conduct Credit: 48 Days; Comment: Count 1 Felony; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 11/19/2019; Consecutive: with count #1; Term Type: 1/3 Middle; Term: 8 Months; Comment: Count 4 Felony; Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $1,200.00; $0.00; $40.00; $40.00; $30.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $1,340.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; **VC2800.4: Driving Wrong Direc While Fleeing Peace Off; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 002; **VC2800.2(a): Evade Peace Officer - Safety; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 003; **VC23152(a)/23550.5(a): Driving Under the Influence Within Ten Years of Prior Felony Conviction; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 003; **PC667.5(a): W/Pr Prison:Violent Felony (ENHANCEMENT); Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 004; **VC23152(b)/23550.5(a):Driving Under Infl. w 0.08% or more/within Ten Years Prior Felony DUI; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 004; **PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 005; **VC23152(a)/23550(a): Felony DUI w/Prior Felony DUI W/In 10 years; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 005; **PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 006; **VC23152(b)/23550: Driving Under the Influence Within Ten Years of Three PriorDUI Violations-Felony; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 006; **PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 007; **VC14601.3(a): Habitual Traffic Offender (TSE); Dism: Other Dismissal; Charge Number: 008; **VC14601.2(d)(2): Drive Suspended/Revoked w/Priors; Dism: Other Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; **VC2800.4: Driving Wrong Direc While Fleeing Peace Off; No Contest; Charge Number: 004; **VC23152(b)/23550.5(a):Driving Under Infl. w 0.08% or more/within Ten Years Prior Felony DUI; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • FinancialGonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel; Transaction Assessment; $1340.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReadiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Gonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Charges; Charge Number: 001; **VC2800.4: Driving Wrong Direc While Fleeing Peace Off; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; **VC2800.2(a): Evade Peace Officer - Safety; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; **VC23152(a)/23550.5(a): Driving Under the Influence Within Ten Years of Prior Felony Conviction; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; **PC667.5(a): W/Pr Prison:Violent Felony (ENHANCEMENT); Denied; Charge Number: 004; **VC23152(b)/23550.5(a):Driving Under Infl. w 0.08% or more/within Ten Years Prior Felony DUI; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; **PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Denied; Charge Number: 005; **VC23152(a)/23550(a): Felony DUI w/Prior Felony DUI W/In 10 years; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 005; **PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Denied; Charge Number: 006; **VC23152(b)/23550: Driving Under the Influence Within Ten Years of Three PriorDUI Violations-Felony; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 006; **PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Denied; Charge Number: 007; **VC14601.3(a): Habitual Traffic Offender (TSE); Not Guilty; Charge Number: 008; **VC14601.2(d)(2): Drive Suspended/Revoked w/Priors; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel; Charge #: 003; Description: **PC667.5(a): W/Pr Prison:Violent Felony (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel; Charge #: 003; Description: PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel; Charge #: 003; Description: **VC23152(a)/23550.5(a): Driving Under the Influence Within Ten Years of Prior Felony Conviction; Statute: 23152(a)/23550.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel; Charge #: 003; Description: VC23152(a)/23550.5(a): Driving Under the Influence Within Ten Years of Prior Felony Conviction; Statute: 23152(a)/23550.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel; Charge #: 002; Description: PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel; Charge #: 002; Description: VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Statute: 2800.2; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel; Charge #: 002; Description: **VC2800.2(a): Evade Peace Officer - Safety; Statute: 2800.2(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel; Charge #: 001; Description: **VC2800.4: Driving Wrong Direc While Fleeing Peace Off; Statute: 2800.4; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Gregorio Esquivel; Charge #: 001; Description: VC2800.4: Driving Wrong Direc While Fleeing Peace Off; Statute: 2800.4; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Turner, Leslie Allan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heil, Austin Brooke

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colby, Travis