This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 17:08:02 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Gilbert Rosas

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Gilbert Rosas. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0408

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Rosas, Gilbert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Egan, Gerad Denis

Colby, Travis

Wilson, Anthony T.

Defendant Attorneys

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Andrade, Vincent

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/21/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/21/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/26/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Pretrial Electronic Monitoring Program Form

01/26/2022: Pretrial Electronic Monitoring Program Form

Criminal: Minute Order

02/09/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Rosas, Gilbert; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPretrial Electronic Monitoring Program Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Wilson, Anthony T.; Defendant: Rosas, Gilbert; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC12022.7(a): GBI:Great Bodily Injury; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Rosas, Gilbert; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Rosas, Gilbert; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022.7(a): GBI:Great Bodily Injury; Statute: 12022.7(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Rosas, Gilbert; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berger, Richard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene