This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 17:08:48 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Gilbert Mendez, Junior

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Gilbert Mendez, Junior. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hansen, Ronald and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0365

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hansen, Ronald

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Mendez, Gilbert, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Min, Thomas Keynes

Egan, Gerad Denis

Boyer, Kayla A

Defendant Attorneys

Lee, Beth A

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Petition Revocation Parole - PC3000.08

01/20/2022: Petition Revocation Parole - PC3000.08

Criminal: Minute Order

01/21/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/31/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/03/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/08/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketViolation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Parole; Original Type: Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Parole; Original Type: Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Boyer, Kayla A; Defendant: Mendez, Gilbert, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Lee, Beth A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Parole; Original Type: Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Mendez, Gilbert, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3000.08(f): Revocation-Parole; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Parole; Original Type: Arraignment: Parole; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Mendez, Gilbert, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Revocation Parole - PC3000.08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Mendez, Gilbert, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC3000.08(f): Revocation-Parole; Statute: 3000.08(f); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Beth A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene