This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/23/2020 at 02:20:36 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Gabriel Zamora

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Gabriel Zamora. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Bissig, Louis F. and Jacobs, Harry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0701

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Bissig, Louis F.

Jacobs, Harry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Zamora, Gabriel Chavez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Silva, Michael

Defendant Attorneys

Lyon, Paul J

Public Defender, Deputy

 

Court Documents

Complaint

02/01/2016: Complaint

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

02/02/2016: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Monthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

04/27/2016: Monthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

Failure to Comply

08/05/2016: Failure to Comply

Notice of Court Action-Alcohol Diversion Prg

08/05/2016: Notice of Court Action-Alcohol Diversion Prg

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

06/02/2017: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Notice of Hearing

02/02/2018: Notice of Hearing

Criminal: Minute Order

03/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/30/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

02/11/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • FinancialZamora, Gabriel Chavez; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2019-04147; Zamora, Gabriel Chavez; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • FinancialZamora, Gabriel Chavez; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2019-01501; Zamora, Gabriel Chavez; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • FinancialZamora, Gabriel Chavez; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2018-12106; Zamora, Gabriel Chavez; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWalk-In; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Zamora, Gabriel Chavez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketProof: Completion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • FinancialZamora, Gabriel Chavez; Counter Payment; Receipt # CL-2018-14579; Zamora, Gabriel Chavez; $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketProof: Enrollment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Zamora, Gabriel Chavez

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2016
  • FinancialZamora, Gabriel Chavez; Transaction Assessment; $1220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Zamora, Gabriel Chavez; Deputy Public Defender: Lyon, Paul J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silva, Michael; Defendant: Zamora, Gabriel Chavez; Deputy Public Defender: Lyon, Paul J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(f): Driving Under Influence of Alcohol and Drug; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • DocketWalk-In; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Zamora, Gabriel Chavez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Zamora, Gabriel Chavez; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23103.5: Wet Reckless; Statute: 23103.5; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silva, Michael Joe