This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 04:47:03 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Freddy Walker, Junior

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Freddy Walker, Junior. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Moranda, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1889

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Walker, Freddy Jr, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Asdorian, Blake M

Navarro, Chris Reyes

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Howard, Sean

Galeon, Erica Joy

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/25/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

03/25/2020: Complaint

Release Order

03/25/2020: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/01/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/29/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/27/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/24/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/28/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/18/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Original Type: Arraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Navarro, Chris Reyes; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Galeon, Erica Joy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Navarro, Chris Reyes; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Navarro, Chris Reyes; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Galeon, Erica Joy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Chu, Erica Joy Galeon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 004; PC594(a)(2): Vandalism:Damage Property; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC591.5: Damage/Obstruct Use-Wireless Comm Device; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC242: Battery; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Walker, Freddy Jr, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Walker, Freddy Jr, Junior; Charge #: 004; Description: PC594(a)(2): Vandalism:Damage Property; Statute: 594(a)(2); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Walker, Freddy Jr, Junior; Charge #: 003; Description: PC242: Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Walker, Freddy Jr, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: PC591.5: Damage/Obstruct Use-Wireless Comm Device; Statute: 591.5; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Walker, Freddy Jr, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard, Sean

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Galeon, Erica Joy