This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 11/01/2021 at 17:02:37 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Franky Pilcher

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Franky Pilcher. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4855

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Pilcher, Franky Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Compton, Misty

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorneys

Lee, Beth A

Mclean, Todd Eugene

 

Court Documents

Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

10/04/2021: Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

Criminal: Minute Order

10/05/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/14/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/22/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Original Type: Violation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Original Type: Violation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Pilcher, Franky Daniel; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Original Type: Violation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Pilcher, Franky Daniel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: PRCS; Original Type: Arraignment: PRCS; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Pilcher, Franky Daniel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Pilcher, Franky Daniel; Charge #: 001; Description: PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Statute: 3455(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Beth A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene