Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/18/2020 at 18:22:32 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Fabian Martinez

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Fabian Martinez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Kirihara, John and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0317

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Kirihara, John

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Martinez, Fabian Adrian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Bakich, Donna

Defendant Attorneys

Lope, Armando

Rodriguez, Adam J

 

Court Documents

Order

07/12/2019: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Memorandum

07/05/2019: Memorandum

Criminal: Minute Order

07/05/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Probation Orders

06/12/2019: Probation Orders

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended) dated 06/13/19

06/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended) dated 06/13/19

Criminal: Minute Order

06/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/07/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

06/05/2019: Motion

Order

05/02/2019: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/02/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/23/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Information

02/20/2019: Information

Criminal: Minute Order

02/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/25/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/23/2019: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/23/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketModification; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Martinez, Fabian Adrian; Contract Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketModification; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant; Contract Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbation Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant; Contract Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketProbation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketProhibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Martinez, Fabian Adrian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Fabian Adrian; Charge #: 005; Description: PC166.4: Failure To Comply W/Court Order; Statute: 166.4; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Fabian Adrian; Charge #: 004; Description: PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Fabian Adrian; Charge #: 004; Description: **PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Fabian Adrian; Charge #: 003; Description: **PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Fabian Adrian; Charge #: 003; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Fabian Adrian; Charge #: 002; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Fabian Adrian; Charge #: 002; Description: **PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Fabian Adrian; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Fabian Adrian; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(f)(1): Domestic Violence with Injury, Prior Conviction; Statute: 273.5(f)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodriguez, Adam J