Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/01/2020 at 00:23:49 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Drew Telles

Case Summary

On 05/26/2017 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Drew Telles. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Shaver, Donald and Dougherty, Frank. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2882

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Shaver, Donald

Dougherty, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Telles, Drew Christian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bakich, Donna

Defendant Attorneys

George, Shawn M.

Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/12/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Plea In Absentia

11/06/2017: Plea In Absentia

Criminal: Minute Order

11/06/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/07/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/03/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

06/02/2017: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Complaint

05/26/2017: Complaint

Notice

04/28/2017: Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketProof: Completion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • FinancialTelles, Drew Christian; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2018-02634; Telles, Drew Christian; $1095.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof: Enrollment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWalk-In; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Telles, Drew Christian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • FinancialTelles, Drew Christian; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2017-14211; Telles, Drew Christian; $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DispositionProbation with Program; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23103.5: Wet Reckless; Probation with Program; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 11/06/2017; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 11/05/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 11/06/2017; Programs; Wet Reckless Class (Enroll within 30 Days); Ordered; Party: Telles, Drew Christian; Order Date: 11/06/2017; Enroll by Date: 12/08/2017; Fee Totals; $1,220.00; Fee Totals; $1,220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23103.5: Wet Reckless; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 003; VC22102: Illegal U-Turn In Business District (TSE); Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23103.5: Wet Reckless; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • FinancialTelles, Drew Christian; Transaction Assessment; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • FinancialTelles, Drew Christian; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Bakich, Donna; Defendant; Retained: George, Shawn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; VC22102: Illegal U-Turn In Business District (TSE); Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Retained: Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketRelease: O/R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Telles, Drew Christian; Charge #: 003; Description: VC22102: Illegal U-Turn In Business District (TSE); Statute: 22102; Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Telles, Drew Christian; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Telles, Drew Christian; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23103.5: Wet Reckless; Statute: 23103.5; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bakich, Donna