This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 10:47:08 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Dover Donnie Graham

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Dover Donnie Graham. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0142

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Graham, Dover Donnie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Madayag, Kimberly

Defendant Attorneys

Noguera, Michael Anthony

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

01/10/2020: Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

Criminal: Minute Order

01/13/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Stop Collection of Probation Fees

01/26/2021: Stop Collection of Probation Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStop Collection of Probation Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 01/13/2020; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 30 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 6 Days; Conduct Credit: 6 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Admits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: PRCS; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Madayag, Kimberly; Defendant: Graham, Dover Donnie; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Graham, Dover Donnie; Charge #: 001; Description: PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Statute: 3455(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent