Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/24/2020 at 20:53:17 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Derek German, Senior

Case Summary

On 06/02/2016 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Derek German, Senior. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Dougherty, Frank, Mewhinney, Douglas V. and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3666

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Dougherty, Frank

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

German, Derek Charles, Senior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colby, Travis

Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn

Creeger, Matthew L

Bakich, Donna

Defendant Attorneys

Lope, Armando

Public Defender, Deputy

Lyon, Paul J

Meyer, Derek Scott

Andrade, Vincent

Green, Anthony C

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

12/21/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/14/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

12/06/2018: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

07/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

06/22/2018: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

06/22/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

12/19/2016: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Pretrial Electronic Monitoring Program Form

07/22/2016: Pretrial Electronic Monitoring Program Form

Order

06/06/2016: Order

Complaint

06/02/2016: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • DispositionSentence; Charges; Charge Number: 006; VOP #3 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 12/21/2018; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 90 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 2 Days; Comment: VOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 006; VOP #3 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 006; VOP #3 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: German, Derek Charles, Senior; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC594(a): Vandalism; Sentence; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 09/21/2016; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 10/29/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/21/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 12/28/2016; Comment: VOP #1 filed 12/19/16; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 01/18/2017; Comment: VOP #1 Admitted; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 06/22/2018; Comment: VOP #2 filed 6/22/18; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 07/09/2018; Comment: VOP #2 filed 6/22/18 admitted; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 12/19/2018; Comment: VOP #3 filed 12-06-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketProbation is revoked; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: VOP; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • ChargeCharges: German, Derek Charles, Senior; Charge #: 006; Description: VOP #3 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn; Defendant: German, Derek Charles, Senior; Deputy Public Defender: Lyon, Paul J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Arrest Only; Charge Number: 003; PC594(b)(1): Vandalism ($400 Or More); Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: German, Derek Charles, Senior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: German, Derek Charles, Senior; Charge #: 003; Description: PC594(b)(1): Vandalism ($400 Or More); Statute: 594(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: German, Derek Charles, Senior; Charge #: 002; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: German, Derek Charles, Senior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lyon, Paul J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berger, Richard