This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/17/2022 at 13:51:42 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. David Contreras

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against David Contreras. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1404

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Contreras, David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Defendant Attorney

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/16/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

03/16/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC273a(b): Cause Or Permit Cruelty To A Child; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC273a(b): Cause or Permit Cruelty to a Child; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Contreras, David; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Contreras, David; Charge #: 003; Description: PC273a(b): Cause Or Permit Cruelty To A Child; Statute: 273a(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Contreras, David; Charge #: 002; Description: PC273a(b): Cause or Permit Cruelty to a Child; Statute: 273a(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Contreras, David; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent