This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/08/2020 at 12:22:25 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Darryl Landre Turner, II

Case Summary

On 05/08/2018 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Darryl Landre Turner, II. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tsenin, Ksenia, Schechter, Jeanne, Shaver, Donald, Kirihara, John, Moranda, David, Fredricks, Josh M., Lo, Paul and LaPorte, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2124

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tsenin, Ksenia

Schechter, Jeanne

Shaver, Donald

Kirihara, John

Moranda, David

Fredricks, Josh M.

Lo, Paul

LaPorte, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Turner, Darryl Landre, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bakich, Donna

McKean, Tyler

Compton, Misty

Rosenthal, Sara R

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Lope, Armando

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/24/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

01/16/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

01/03/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

12/21/2018: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

12/21/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

12/13/2018: Motion

Request

11/29/2018: Request

Motion

11/26/2018: Motion

Trial Exhibit List

11/02/2018: Trial Exhibit List

Verdict

11/02/2018: Verdict

Verdict

11/02/2018: Verdict

Information Amended

10/30/2018: Information Amended

Information Amended

10/16/2018: Information Amended

Witness List

10/16/2018: Witness List

Criminal: Minute Order

07/06/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Information

06/29/2018: Information

Criminal: Minute Order

05/23/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DispositionAmended Prison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; 2nd****PC597(a): Kill, Maim, Torture, Mutilate Animal; Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 02/14/2019; Term Type: Upper; Term: 3 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 275 Days; Conduct Credit: 275 Days; Comment: Count 1-Felony; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 12/21/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 02/14/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 01/17/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 01/17/2019; Comment: VOP #1 filed 1-16-19; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 02/14/2019; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 02/14/2019; Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 006; VOP#1 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 006; VOP#1 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • FinancialTurner, Darryl Landre, II; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Turner, Darryl Landre, II; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Turner, Darryl Landre, II; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Turner, Darryl Landre, II; Charge #: 001; Description: 1st**** PC597(a): Kill, Maim, Torture, Mutilate Animal; Statute: 597(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Turner, Darryl Landre, II; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC597(a): Kill, Maim, Torture, Mutilate Animal; Statute: 597(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Turner, Darryl Landre, II; Charge #: 001; Description: PC597(a): Kill, Maim, Torture, Mutilate Animal; Statute: 597(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Turner, Darryl Landre, II; Charge #: 005; Description: 2nd**PC242: Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Turner, Darryl Landre, II; Charge #: 004; Description: 2nd**PC242: Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Turner, Darryl Landre, II; Charge #: 003; Description: 2nd**PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Turner, Darryl Landre, II; Charge #: 002; Description: 2nd**PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Turner, Darryl Landre, II; Charge #: 001; Description: 2nd**PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Turner, Darryl Landre, II; Charge #: 001; Description: 2nd****PC597(a): Kill, Maim, Torture, Mutilate Animal; Statute: 597(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McMillan, Matthew Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent