This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 17:01:38 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Danny Magdaleno, Junior

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Danny Magdaleno, Junior. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Merced County Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foster, David, Lo, Paul and Moranda, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0876

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foster, David

Lo, Paul

Moranda, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Magdaleno, Danny, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elgin, David

Newman, Jeffrey Samuel

Haro, Quetzalli G.

Colby, Travis

Defendant Attorneys

Page, Kathleen Coleen

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/16/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

02/16/2022: Complaint

Release Order

02/16/2022: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/28/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/02/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Magdaleno, Danny, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Newman, Jeffrey Samuel; Deputy Public Defender: Haro, Quetzalli G.; Defendant: Magdaleno, Danny, Junior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11364: Possession of paraphernalia for controlled substance; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC647(f): Disorderly Conduct:Under Infl Drug/Alcohol; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Elgin, David; Defendant: Magdaleno, Danny, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Magdaleno, Danny, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: PC647(f): Disorderly Conduct:Under Infl Drug/Alcohol; Statute: 647(f); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Magdaleno, Danny, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11364: Possession of paraphernalia for controlled substance; Statute: 11364; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, Kathleen Coleen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent