This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/15/2022 at 16:02:08 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Danny Magdeleno, Junior

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Danny Magdeleno, Junior. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0974

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Magdeleno, Danny, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Egan, Gerad Denis

Colby, Travis

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Page, Kathleen Coleen

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/22/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

02/22/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

03/02/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC459: Burglary; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC243(d): Battery With Serious Bodily Injury; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Magdeleno, Danny, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketReport: Probation Officer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Magdeleno, Danny, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Magdeleno, Danny, Junior; Charge #: 004; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Magdeleno, Danny, Junior; Charge #: 003; Description: PC243(d): Battery With Serious Bodily Injury; Statute: 243(d); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Magdeleno, Danny, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Magdeleno, Danny, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC459: Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, Kathleen Coleen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent