This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 01/29/2022 at 02:08:35 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Carlos Romo

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Carlos Romo. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, Moranda, David, McCabe, Brian and Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5435

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Moranda, David

McCabe, Brian

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Romo, Carlos Gomez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Creeger, Matthew L

Colby, Travis

Roland, Tracy Marie

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Page, Kathleen Coleen

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

11/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

11/08/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

11/12/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/03/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/10/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/28/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketProhibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirearms Relinquishment Hearing; Original Type: Firearms Relinquishment Hearing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialRomo, Carlos Gomez; Transaction Assessment; $41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialRomo, Carlos Gomez; Transaction Assessment; $1310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DispositionProbation with Program; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Probation with Program; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Probation with Program; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 12/10/2021; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 90 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 37 Days; Conduct Credit: 36 Days; Comment: Count 1, Felony; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 12/10/2021; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 12/09/2024; Status; Status: Active; Date: 12/10/2021; Programs; BTP: 52 Week Class; Ordered; Party: Romo, Carlos Gomez; Order Date: 12/10/2021; Fee Totals; $40.00; $40.00; $30.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; No Contest; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • FinancialRomo, Carlos Gomez; Transaction Assessment; $140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Romo, Carlos Gomez; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Romo, Carlos Gomez; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Romo, Carlos Gomez; Charge #: 002; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Romo, Carlos Gomez; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, Kathleen Coleen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael