Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/09/2020 at 18:03:27 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Calvin Rasberry, Junior

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Calvin Rasberry, Junior. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Shaver, Donald, Kirihara, John and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3543

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Shaver, Donald

Kirihara, John

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colby, Travis

Compton, Misty

Nored, Thane

McCoy, Tyson John

Loethen, Christopher Paul

Bakich, Donna

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Coughlin, Michael

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

06/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

05/15/2019: Motion

Abstract of Judgment

04/04/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

04/03/2019: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

04/03/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/29/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Report

03/27/2019: Report

Criminal: Minute Order

03/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/13/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/06/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

01/24/2019: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

01/16/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

01/10/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Fingerprint Card

07/20/2018: Fingerprint Card

Criminal: Minute Order

07/20/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

07/16/2018: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

07/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketModification; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • FinancialRasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DispositionAmended Prison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 04/03/2019; Term Type: Upper; Term: 3 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 202 Days; Conduct Credit: 202 Days; Comment: VOP; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 07/20/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 04/03/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 07/20/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 01/11/2019; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 04/03/2019; Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Bakich, Donna; Defendant: Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Bakich, Donna; Defendant: Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Charge #: 010; Description: PC591: Damage Telephone/Power Line; Statute: 591; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Charge #: 009; Description: PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Statute: 422; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Charge #: 008; Description: PC273(d): Parent Receive Multiple Pay/Etc For Adoption; Statute: 273(d); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Charge #: 007; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Charge #: 006; Description: PC591.5: Damage/Obstruct Use-Wireless Comm Device; Statute: 591.5; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Charge #: 005; Description: PC236: False Imprisonment; Statute: 236; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Charge #: 004; Description: PC273d(a): Corporal Punishment/Inflict Injury Upon Child; Statute: 273d(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Charge #: 003; Description: PC273.5(f)(1): Domestic Violence with Injury, Prior Conviction; Statute: 273.5(f)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: PC646.9(b): Stalking:Temporary Restraining Order/Etc; Statute: 646.9(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rasberry, Calvin Ray, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Statute: 422(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent