This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 12:01:56 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Brian Bradbury

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Brian Bradbury. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Breen, Thomas P., Schechter, Jeanne, Hollman, James, Hansen, Ronald, Kirihara, John, Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Lo, Paul and LaPorte, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4278

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Breen, Thomas P.

Schechter, Jeanne

Hollman, James

Hansen, Ronald

Kirihara, John

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Lo, Paul

LaPorte, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Bradbury, Brian George

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Compton, Misty

Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph

Rosenthal, Sara R

Colby, Travis

Silveira, Nicole A.

Bakich, Donna

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

Howard, Sean

Coughlin, Michael

Elgin, David

Andrade, Vincent

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

06/05/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/27/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/27/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/31/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/17/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

05/08/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/01/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Information Deemed Complaint

04/17/2019: Information Deemed Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

04/10/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/12/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Certificate

11/05/2018: Certificate

Request

11/05/2018: Request

Criminal: Minute Order

10/23/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/19/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/22/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Bradbury, Brian George; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Bradbury, Brian George; Deputy Public Defender: Howard, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Bradbury, Brian George

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Bradbury, Brian George; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Original Type: Doctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Bradbury, Brian George; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Original Type: Doctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Bradbury, Brian George

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Bakich, Donna; Defendant: Bradbury, Brian George; Deputy Public Defender: McMillan, Matthew Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Bradbury, Brian George; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Bradbury, Brian George; Charge #: 003; Description: PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Statute: 422; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Bradbury, Brian George; Charge #: 002; Description: PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Statute: 69; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Bradbury, Brian George; Charge #: 002; Description: *PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Statute: 69; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Bradbury, Brian George; Charge #: 001; Description: *PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Statute: 422(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Bradbury, Brian George; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Statute: 422(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McMillan, Matthew Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elgin, David

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard, Sean