Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 18:11:19 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Brad Denys

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Brad Denys. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Moranda, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7761

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Denys, Brad Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Asdorian, Blake M

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

McMillan, Matthew Scott

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

06/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/01/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/25/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/18/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/19/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/08/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

01/04/2018: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Complaint

12/19/2017: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11364: Possess Controlled Substance Paraphernalia; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Denys, Brad Lee; Deputy Public Defender: McMillan, Matthew Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11364: Possess Controlled Substance Paraphernalia; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant: Denys, Brad Lee; Deputy Public Defender: McMillan, Matthew Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketRelease: O/R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Denys, Brad Lee; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11364: Possess Controlled Substance Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McMillan, Matthew Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent