This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/24/2020 at 19:20:43 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Bobby Rivera, Junior

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Bobby Rivera, Junior. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Hansen, Ronald, Kirihara, John and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6189

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Hansen, Ronald

Kirihara, John

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Rivera, Bobby, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heil, Austin Brooke

Asdorian, Blake M

McCoy, Tyson John

Defendant Attorneys

Chu, Erica Joy Galeon

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

11/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

11/15/2019: Complaint

Release Order

11/15/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/16/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/27/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/16/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Chu, Erica Joy Galeon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Heil, Austin Brooke; Defendant: Rivera, Bobby, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Chu, Erica Joy Galeon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Heil, Austin Brooke; Defendant: Rivera, Bobby, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Chu, Erica Joy Galeon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Heil, Austin Brooke; Defendant: Rivera, Bobby, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Chu, Erica Joy Galeon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Arrest Only; Charge Number: 003; PC136.1(c)(1): Prevent/Dissuade Witness/Victim-Force/Threat (ENHANCEMENT); Arrest Only; Charge Number: 004; PC591.5: Damage/Obstruct Use-Wireless Comm Device; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC664/591: Attempted Tampering Telephone/Cable TV; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McCoy, Tyson John; Defendant: Rivera, Bobby, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Rivera, Bobby, Junior; Charge #: 004; Description: PC591.5: Damage/Obstruct Use-Wireless Comm Device; Statute: 591.5; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Rivera, Bobby, Junior; Charge #: 003; Description: PC136.1(c)(1): Prevent/Dissuade Witness/Victim-Force/Threat (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 136.1(c)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Rivera, Bobby, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Statute: 422; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Rivera, Bobby, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC664/591: Attempted Tampering Telephone/Cable TV; Statute: 664/591; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McCoy, Tyson John

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heil, Austin Brooke

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Asdorian, Blake M