This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 17:04:37 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Arturo Chavez Torres

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Arturo Chavez Torres. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Hollman, James, Breen, Thomas P. and McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4161

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Hollman, James

Breen, Thomas P.

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Torres, Arturo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Min, Thomas Keynes

Colby, Travis

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/03/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/03/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/10/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 001; PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Stricken; Charge Number: 001; PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Stricken; Charge Number: 001; PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Stricken

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC242: Battery; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDefense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketConviction Certified by Clerk of the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCourt Found Plea Knowledgeable; Intelligently Made Voluntary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront And Cross Examine Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Torres, Arturo; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Torres, Arturo; Charge #: 002; Description: PC242: Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Torres, Arturo; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Statute: 12022(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Torres, Arturo; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Torres, Arturo; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Torres, Arturo; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Statute: 422; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent