This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 17:01:13 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Antonio David Jacobo, III

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Antonio David Jacobo, III. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, Hollman, James and Slocum, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4101

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Hollman, James

Slocum, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Jacobo, Antonio David, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Min, Thomas Keynes

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Sok, Curtis B

Meyer, Derek Scott

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/22/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Declaration

09/14/2021: Declaration

Criminal: Minute Order

09/13/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/09/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/03/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

09/02/2021: Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Terminated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Original Type: Violation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Jacobo, Antonio David, III; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Original Type: Violation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Jacobo, Antonio David, III; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Original Type: Violation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Jacobo, Antonio David, III; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: PRCS; Original Type: Arraignment: PRCS; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Jacobo, Antonio David, III; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobo, Antonio David, III; Charge #: 001; Description: PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Statute: 3455(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Derek Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent