This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 18:02:19 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Antemio Cortes

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Antemio Cortes. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Foster, David and Fredricks, Josh M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4856

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Foster, David

Fredricks, Josh M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Cortes, Antemio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Navarro, Chris Reyes

Defendant Attorneys

Lope, Armando

Merced County Public Defender

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/04/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

10/05/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/12/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/26/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/02/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/16/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Navarro, Chris Reyes; Defendant: Cortes, Antemio; Retained: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Navarro, Chris Reyes; Defendant: Cortes, Antemio; Retained: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Navarro, Chris Reyes; Defendant: Cortes, Antemio; Retained: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC20002(a): Hit And Run-Fail to Stop; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Cortes, Antemio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Fredricks, Josh M.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Cortes, Antemio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Cortes, Antemio; Charge #: 001; Description: VC20002(a): Hit And Run-Fail to Stop; Statute: 20002(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando