This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/08/2020 at 20:19:48 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Angelina RuizQuintana

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Angelina RuizQuintana. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2586

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

RuizQuintana, Angelina Serena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Boyer, Kayla A

Madayag, Kimberly

Bakich, Donna

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

Lope, Armando

Noguera, Michael Anthony

Berger, Richard

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/08/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/25/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/29/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/10/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond Exonerated

02/11/2019: Bail Bond Exonerated

Criminal: Minute Order

02/11/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice of Bail Forfeiture

01/17/2019: Notice of Bail Forfeiture

Criminal: Minute Order

01/11/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

12/03/2018: Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

12/03/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/07/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/26/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/11/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/08/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond Booking Sheet

06/06/2018: Bail Bond Booking Sheet

Bail Bond

06/06/2018: Bail Bond

Receipt of Recent Communication

06/06/2018: Receipt of Recent Communication

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDiversion Hearing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: RuizQuintana, Angelina Serena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketRelease: O/R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDiversion Hearing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: RuizQuintana, Angelina Serena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketRequest; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Madayag, Kimberly; Defendant: Ruizquintana, Angelina Serena; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • ChargeCharges: RuizQuintana, Angelina Serena; Charge #: 002; Description: PC166.4: Failure To Comply W/Court Order; Statute: 166.4; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • ChargeCharges: RuizQuintana, Angelina Serena; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McMillan, Matthew Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando