This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/04/2022 at 17:01:56 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Angel Francisco Banderas

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Angel Francisco Banderas. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Banderas, Angel Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorney

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

01/07/2022: Petition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

Criminal: Minute Order

01/12/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/27/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation Supervision; Original Type: Violation Supervision; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: PRCS; Original Type: Arraignment: PRCS; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Banderas, Angel Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Revocation PRCS - PC3455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Banderas, Angel Francisco; Charge #: 001; Description: PC3455(a): Revocation-Post Release Community Supervision; Statute: 3455(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent