Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/25/2020 at 22:15:26 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Amy Challis

Case Summary

On 07/27/2016 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Amy Challis. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5045

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Challis, Amy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hegland, Caleb

Colby, Travis

Defendant Attorneys

Samrao, Ramnik S

Green, Anthony

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

11/15/2018: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

06/13/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/21/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/25/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

10/11/2017: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Court Collections Statement Letter

09/12/2017: Court Collections Statement Letter

Returned Mail

08/28/2017: Returned Mail

Court Collections Statement Letter

08/08/2017: Court Collections Statement Letter

Release Order

06/14/2017: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/14/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/09/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

02/21/2017: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Complaint

07/27/2016: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DispositionAmended Probation with Program; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC10851(a): Take Vehicle Without Owners Consent; Probation with Program; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 08/12/2016; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 08/12/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/12/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 02/22/2017; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 06/14/2017; Comment: VOP #1 filed 02/21/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/25/2017; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 06/13/2018; Programs; Suitable Placement Program; Ordered; Party: Challis, Amy; Order Date: 06/13/2018; Comment: Solace Supportive Living

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 008; VOP #2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 008; VOP #2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Challis, Amy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWalk-In; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Challis, Amy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC10851(a): Take Vehicle Without Owners Consent; Probation; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 08/12/2016; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 08/12/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/12/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 02/22/2017; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 06/14/2017; Comment: VOP #1 filed 02/21/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketProbation is revoked; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Challis, Amy; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC10851(a): Take Vehicle Without Owners Consent; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC496d(a): Buy/Receive Stolen Vehicle/Equipment; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC496(b): Vendor Receiving Stolen Property; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; PC496(b): Vendor Receiving Stolen Property; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 005; PC496(b): Vendor Receiving Stolen Property; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 006; HS11377(a): Possession Of A Controlled Substance; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Challis, Amy; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Challis, Amy; Charge #: 006; Description: HS11377(a): Possession Of A Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Challis, Amy; Charge #: 005; Description: PC496(b): Vendor Receiving Stolen Property; Statute: 496(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Challis, Amy; Charge #: 004; Description: PC496(b): Vendor Receiving Stolen Property; Statute: 496(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Challis, Amy; Charge #: 003; Description: PC496(b): Vendor Receiving Stolen Property; Statute: 496(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Challis, Amy; Charge #: 002; Description: PC496d(a): Buy/Receive Stolen Vehicle/Equipment; Statute: 496d(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Challis, Amy; Charge #: 001; Description: VC10851(a): Take Vehicle Without Owners Consent; Statute: 10851(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hegland, Caleb

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colby, Travis