This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/19/2020 at 17:28:33 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Akina Macklin

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Akina Macklin. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1224

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Macklin, Akina Diani

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Silveira, Nicole A.

Bakich, Donna

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

Coughlin, Michael

McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

03/12/2019: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

03/13/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Fingerprint Card

03/13/2019: Fingerprint Card

Criminal: Minute Order

03/20/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

03/20/2019: Release Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • FinancialMacklin, Akina Diani; Electronic (Online) Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-16284; Macklin, Akina Diani; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • FinancialMacklin, Akina Diani; Electronic (Online) Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-13200; Macklin, Akina Diani; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • FinancialMacklin, Akina Diani; Electronic (Online) Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-09831; Macklin, Akina Diani; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC530.5(a): Use Another's Personal Identification To Obta; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 03/20/2019; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 25 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 13 Days; Conduct Credit: 12 Days; Comment: Credit for time served; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 03/20/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 03/19/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 03/20/2019; Fee Totals; $150.00; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC459: Burglary; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; PC530.5(a): Use Another's Personal Identification To Obta; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 003; PC484g: Theft By Forged/Invalid Access Card; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC530.5(a): Use Another's Personal Identification To Obta; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • FinancialMacklin, Akina Diani; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • FinancialMacklin, Akina Diani; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketMonthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Macklin, Akina Diani; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFingerprint Card; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Macklin, Akina Diani; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC459: Burglary; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC530.5(a): Use Another's Personal Identification To Obta; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC484g: Theft By Forged/Invalid Access Card; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Macklin, Akina Diani; Deputy Public Defender: McInally, Nicholas Bernard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Macklin, Akina Diani; Charge #: 003; Description: PC484g: Theft By Forged/Invalid Access Card; Statute: 484g; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Macklin, Akina Diani; Charge #: 002; Description: PC530.5(a): Use Another's Personal Identification To Obta; Statute: 530.5(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Macklin, Akina Diani; Charge #: 001; Description: PC459: Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bakich, Donna

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silveira, Nicole A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Egan, Gerad Denis