This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/08/2022 at 17:02:15 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plantiff(s) vs. Damian Salvador Quintanilla, Senior, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 People of the State of California, Plantiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Damian Salvador Quintanilla, Senior, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Slocum, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0857

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Slocum, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Quintanilla, Damian Salvador, Senior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Silveira, Nicole A.

Defendant Attorney

Perez, Deborah Najar

 

Court Documents

Complaint

02/08/2022: Complaint

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

02/16/2022: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

02/22/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11351: Possession For Sale Of A Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; HS11378: Controlled Substance - Possession For Sale; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; HS11378: Controlled Substance - Possession For Sale; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; HS11378: Controlled Substance - Possession For Sale; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Quintanilla, Damian Salvador, Senior; Deputy Public Defender: Perez, Deborah Najar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Quintanilla, Damian Salvador, Senior; Charge #: 004; Description: HS11378: Controlled Substance - Possession For Sale; Statute: 11378; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Quintanilla, Damian Salvador, Senior; Charge #: 003; Description: HS11378: Controlled Substance - Possession For Sale; Statute: 11378; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Quintanilla, Damian Salvador, Senior; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11378: Controlled Substance - Possession For Sale; Statute: 11378; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Quintanilla, Damian Salvador, Senior; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11351: Possession For Sale Of A Controlled Substance; Statute: 11351; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Perez, Deborah Najar