This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 15:34:36 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Yasmani Molina, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Yasmani Molina, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, McNatt, Bobby W., Dougherty, Frank and Shaver, Donald. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2354

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

McNatt, Bobby W.

Dougherty, Frank

Shaver, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Molina, Yasmani Manny

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nored, Thane

Defendant Attorneys

Lope, Armando

Freitas, Wade

Merced County Public Defender

 

Court Documents

Revised FTP 2nd Courtesy Notice

06/15/2019: Revised FTP 2nd Courtesy Notice

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

06/26/2017: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

* Public *

10/09/2015: * Public *

Motion

08/31/2015: Motion

Complaint

05/29/2015: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2019
  • FinancialMolina, Yasmani Manny; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Addt'l Collection Notice add Civil Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DispositionDUI Sentencing; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; DUI Sentencing; Fee Totals; $2,170.00; $114.53; Fee Totals; $2,284.53; Programs; DUI: 3 Month Class; Ordered; Party: Molina, Yasmani Manny; Order Date: 10/09/2015; Enroll by Date: 11/09/2015; Duration: 3 Months; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 10/09/2015; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 10/08/2018; Status; Status: Active; Date: 10/09/2015; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 10/09/2015; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 2 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 2 Days; Comment: Time served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: McNatt, Bobby W.; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 003; VC21453(a): Red Signal-Vehicular Responsibilities; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 004; VC16028(a): Fail to Provide Evid Financial Responsibility (POI); Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 005; VC22108: Signal Before Turning/Changing Lanes (TSE); Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: McNatt, Bobby W.; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • FinancialMolina, Yasmani Manny; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • FinancialMolina, Yasmani Manny; Transaction Assessment; $2284.53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketMonthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: McNatt, Bobby W.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketGeneral Time Waived; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Molina, Yasmani Manny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Molina, Yasmani Manny; Charge #: 005; Description: VC22108: Signal Before Turning/Changing Lanes (TSE); Statute: 22108; Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Molina, Yasmani Manny; Charge #: 004; Description: VC16028(a): Fail to Provide Evid Financial Responsibility (POI); Statute: 16028(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Molina, Yasmani Manny; Charge #: 003; Description: VC21453(a): Red Signal-Vehicular Responsibilities; Statute: 21453(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Molina, Yasmani Manny; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Molina, Yasmani Manny; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less