This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 15:34:21 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Trevon Dickinson, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Trevon Dickinson, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, McNatt, Bobby W. and Schechter, Jeanne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2340

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

McNatt, Bobby W.

Schechter, Jeanne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Dickinson, Trevon Edwards

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Compton, Misty

McKinney, Ilia C.

Min, Thomas Keynes

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

Lyon, Paul J

Howard, Sean

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Collection Statement

09/07/2018: Collection Statement

Transfer Receipt

11/30/2016: Transfer Receipt

Transfer Receipt

10/05/2016: Transfer Receipt

Transfer Order

03/07/2016: Transfer Order

Order

06/29/2015: Order

Notice

06/23/2015: Notice

Notice

06/23/2015: Notice

Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea

06/08/2015: Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea

Complaint

05/29/2015: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • FinancialDickinson, Trevon Edwards; Probation Supervision Adjustment For Transfer Out; $540.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCourt Collections Order of Referral for Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransfer Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransfer Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransfer Order; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • DocketTransfer Out; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Lyon, Paul J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • FinancialDickinson, Trevon Edwards; Transaction Assessment; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketReferred to Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketTime Not Waived; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketArraigned: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Turner, Leslie Allan; Defendant: Dickinson, Trevon Edwards; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • ChargeCharges: Dickinson, Trevon Edwards; Charge #: 004; Description: PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 186.22(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • ChargeCharges: Dickinson, Trevon Edwards; Charge #: 003; Description: PC25400(a)(1): Carry Concealed Weapon In Vehicle; Statute: 25400(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • ChargeCharges: Dickinson, Trevon Edwards; Charge #: 002; Description: PC25850(a): Carry Loaded Firearm In Public Place; Statute: 25850(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • ChargeCharges: Dickinson, Trevon Edwards; Charge #: 001; Description: PC33215: Manuf. Weapon: short-barreled rifle/shotgun; Statute: 33215; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less