This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/27/2020 at 12:35:05 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Tina Renee Vierra, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 10/03/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Tina Renee Vierra, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Power, David E., McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Ash, Carol, Jacobs, Harry, Dougherty, Frank, Kalustian, Richard P. and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6495

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Power, David E.

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Ash, Carol

Jacobs, Harry

Dougherty, Frank

Kalustian, Richard P.

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Vierra, Tina Renee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Mckinney, Michael C

Nored, Thane

McAfee, Michael

Martinez, Mathew Joseph

Hanson, Ann

Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph

Creeger, Matthew L

McKean, Tyler

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Freitas, Wade

Meyer, Derek Scott

Green, Anthony

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Release Order

12/04/2017: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/04/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Evaluation Request

10/26/2017: Evaluation Request

Evaluation Request

10/26/2017: Evaluation Request

Criminal: Minute Order

10/23/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/11/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/01/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/21/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

06/26/2017: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/26/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

06/13/2017: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

06/12/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/09/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Evaluation Request

03/02/2017: Evaluation Request

Release Order

02/24/2017: Release Order

Release Order

10/28/2016: Release Order

Evaluation Request

10/11/2016: Evaluation Request

Complaint

10/03/2016: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Dism: Other Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketReopened; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1368; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: McInally, Nicholas Bernard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvaluation Request; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvaluation Request; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Martinez, Mathew Joseph; Defendant: Vierra, Tina Renee; Deputy Public Defender: McInally, Nicholas Bernard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Original Type: Doctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Judicial Officer: Mewhinney, Douglas V.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: McNatt, Bobby W.; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Vierra, Tina Renee; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1368; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McAfee, Michael; Defendant: Vierra, Tina Renee; Deputy Public Defender: McMillan, Matthew Scott; Deputy Public Defender: McMillan, Matthew Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvaluation Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Dougherty, Frank; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Hanson, Ann; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: McMillan, Matthew Scott; Deputy Public Defender: McMillan, Matthew Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKean, Tyler; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Freitas, Wade

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Mckinney, Michael C; Defendant: Vierra, Tina Renee; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Vierra, Tina Renee; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Freitas, Wade

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony