This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 17:01:28 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Timothy Lee Morris, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Timothy Lee Morris, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol, Lo, Paul, McCabe, Brian and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3702

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Lo, Paul

McCabe, Brian

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Morris, Timonthy Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gates, Kathryn

Margain, Andre Carlos

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Mclean, Todd Eugene

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/30/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/25/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

08/18/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

08/18/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Morris, Timonthy Lee; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Morris, Timonthy Lee; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Morris, Timonthy Lee; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied; Charge Number: 002; HS11370.1(a): Possess Cont. Substance Armed W/ Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied; Charge Number: 003; HS11379(a): Transport/Sell Controlled Substance (ENHANCEMENT); Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Morris, Timonthy Lee; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Morris, Timonthy Lee; Charge #: 003; Description: PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Morris, Timonthy Lee; Charge #: 003; Description: HS11379(a): Transport/Sell Controlled Substance (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 11379(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Morris, Timonthy Lee; Charge #: 002; Description: PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Morris, Timonthy Lee; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11370.1(a): Possess Cont. Substance Armed W/ Firearm; Statute: 11370.1(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Morris, Timonthy Lee; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Morris, Timonthy Lee; Charge #: 001; Description: PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene