Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/11/2020 at 15:31:49 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Terri Leigh Wissert, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 10/15/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Terri Leigh Wissert, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Ash, Carol, Kirihara, John, Nakahara, Vernon K. and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5477

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Ash, Carol

Kirihara, John

Nakahara, Vernon K.

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Wissert, Terri Leigh

Wizert, Terri Leigh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Compton, Misty

McAfee, Michael

Rosenthal, Sara R

Nored, Thane

Creeger, Matthew L

Gates, Kathryn

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Meyer, Derek Scott

Green, Anthony C

Lee, Beth A

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment

07/11/2019: Abstract of Judgment

Criminal: Minute Order

07/10/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/20/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

06/06/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

04/23/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

04/18/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

02/21/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/20/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

02/06/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Order

12/18/2018: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/12/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

11/02/2018: Release Order

Order

11/02/2018: Order

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

11/02/2018: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

10/19/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

10/15/2018: Complaint

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC21310: Carry Concealed Dirk Or Dagger; Sentence; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 11/02/2018; Term: 2 Years; End Date: 11/14/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 11/02/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 12/06/2018; Comment: Def. FTA; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 12/18/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 02/20/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 02/21/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 05/02/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 06/12/2019; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 07/10/2019; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 07/10/2019; Term Type: Middle; Term: 2 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 90 Days; Conduct Credit: 90 Days; Comment: VOP #3 (Full sentence to be served straight time in the Merced County Jail pursuant to PC 1170(h).); Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 007; vop # 3 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 007; vop # 3 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • FinancialWissert, Terri Leigh; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Wissert, Terri Leigh; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Wissert, Terri Leigh; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 007; vop # 3 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Nakahara, Vernon K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Nakahara, Vernon K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Wissert, Terri Leigh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC369i(a): Trespass:Railroad Property; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC21310: Carry Concealed Dirk Or Dagger; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Wissert, Terri Leigh; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Wissert, Terri Leigh; Charge #: 003; Description: PC369i(a): Trespass:Railroad Property; Statute: 369i(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Wissert, Terri Leigh; Charge #: 002; Description: PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Wissert, Terri Leigh; Charge #: 001; Description: PC21310: Carry Concealed Dirk Or Dagger; Statute: 21310; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McAfee, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Drexel, Scott Gregory

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gates, Kathryn