This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/01/2020 at 12:18:09 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Taraleika Chauntema Powell, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Taraleika Chauntema Powell, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol, Power, David E. and Shaver, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2901

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Power, David E.

Shaver, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Powell, Taraleika Chauntena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Madayag, Kimberly

Egan, Gerad Denis

Nored, Thane

Defendant Attorneys

Green, Anthony C

Freitas, Wade

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

06/05/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

06/05/2017: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

06/12/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/16/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

06/16/2017: Release Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DispositionSentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC647(f): Disorderly Conduct:Under Infl Drug/Alcohol; Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 06/16/2017; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 60 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 30 Days; Conduct Credit: 30 Days; Comment: Credit for time served.; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 06/16/2017; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 06/15/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 06/16/2017; Fee Totals; $220.00; Fee Totals; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC647(f): Disorderly Conduct:Under Infl Drug/Alcohol; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC647(f): Disorderly Conduct:Under Infl Drug/Alcohol; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • FinancialPowell, Taraleika Chauntena; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Powell, Taraleika Chauntena; Deputy Public Defender: Freitas, Wade

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Powell, Taraleika Chauntena; Deputy Public Defender: Freitas, Wade

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: TBA, Judge; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC459.5: Shoplifting; Arrest Only; Charge Number: 003; PC602(m): Trespass:Occupy Property Without Consent; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Power, David E.; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC314{1}: Indecent Exposure; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Power, David E.; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Madayag, Kimberly; Defendant: Powell, Taraleika Chauntena; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Powell, Taraleika Chauntena; Charge #: 003; Description: PC602(m): Trespass:Occupy Property Without Consent; Statute: 602(m); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Powell, Taraleika Chauntena; Charge #: 002; Description: PC459.5: Shoplifting; Statute: 459.5; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Powell, Taraleika Chauntena; Charge #: 001; Description: PC647(f): Disorderly Conduct:Under Infl Drug/Alcohol; Statute: 647(f); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Freitas, Wade

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony Charles