This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/18/2020 at 12:58:39 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Shawn Anacleto, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/10/2015 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Shawn Anacleto, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Breen, Thomas P., Schechter, Jeanne, McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Ash, Carol, Moranda, David and Jacobs, Harry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******861A

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Breen, Thomas P.

Schechter, Jeanne

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Ash, Carol

Moranda, David

Jacobs, Harry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Anacleto, Shawn Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Compton, Misty

Martinez, Mathew Joseph

Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph

Rosenthal, Sara R

Serratto, Matthew Travers

McKinney, Ilia C.

Bakich, Donna

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

Meyer, Derek Scott

Lyon, Paul J

Andrade, Vincent

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Green, Anthony C

 

Court Documents

Transfer Receipt

04/16/2018: Transfer Receipt

Transfer Order

11/17/2017: Transfer Order

Transfer Order

11/17/2017: Transfer Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/17/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

11/13/2017: Notice

Notice

09/06/2017: Notice

Notice

09/06/2017: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

07/25/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/19/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Violation of Mandatory Supervision

07/18/2017: Affidavit of Violation of Mandatory Supervision

Criminal: Minute Order

07/05/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Abstract of Judgment

06/28/2017: Abstract of Judgment

Criminal: Minute Order

06/27/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/15/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/31/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/24/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

05/22/2017: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Motion

03/30/2017: Motion

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransfer Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransfer Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransfer Order; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransfer Out; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Bakich, Donna; Defendant: Anacleto, Shawn Lee; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DispositionAmended Commitment; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11366.5(a): Knowingly Rent/Etc For Storage/Etc Of Cs; Commitment; Charge Number: 002; PC530.5(a): Use Another's Personal Identification To Obta; Commitment; Adult Confinement; Type: Split Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 07/25/2017; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 30 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 11 Days; Conduct Credit: 10 Days; Probation; Type: Mandatory Supervision; Start Date: 06/27/2017; Term: 18 Months; End Date: 02/27/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 06/27/2017; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 010; VOP#1-PC1170(h)(5)(b): Revocation of Mandatory Supervision; Admits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 010; VOP#1-PC1170(h)(5)(b): Revocation of Mandatory Supervision; Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Martinez, Mathew Joseph; Defendant: Anacleto, Shawn Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Anacleto, Shawn Lee; Charge #: 006; Description: PC530.5(a): Use Another's Personal Identification To Obta; Statute: 530.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Anacleto, Shawn Lee; Charge #: 005; Description: HS11368: Forge/Alter Narcotic Prescription; Statute: 11368; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Anacleto, Shawn Lee; Charge #: 004; Description: PC530.5(a): Use Another's Personal Identification To Obta; Statute: 530.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Anacleto, Shawn Lee; Charge #: 003; Description: HS11368: Forge/Alter Narcotic Prescription; Statute: 11368; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Anacleto, Shawn Lee; Charge #: 002; Description: PC530.5(a): Use Another's Personal Identification To Obta; Statute: 530.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Anacleto, Shawn Lee; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11366.5(a): Knowingly Rent/Etc For Storage/Etc Of Cs; Statute: 11366.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Toscano, Jeremiah Joseph

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bakich, Donna

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McKinney, Ilia C.