This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/08/2020 at 17:12:34 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Saul Moralesacosta, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Saul Moralesacosta, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Schechter, Jeanne and Shaver, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2438

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Schechter, Jeanne

Shaver, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Moralesacosta, Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Miller, Rachel Kohlman

Noguera, Michael Anthony

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

05/24/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

05/24/2018: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

05/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/31/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

05/31/2018: Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

06/28/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Monthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

07/02/2018: Monthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

Criminal: Minute Order

09/28/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/28/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/29/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Documents Received (Proof)

03/29/2019: Documents Received (Proof)

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

04/18/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

07/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Moralesacosta, Saul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketProof: Completion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocuments Received (Proof)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Moralesacosta, Saul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMisdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketFirearm Relinquishment Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Moralesacosta, Saul; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Moralesacosta, Saul; Deputy Public Defender: Miller, Rachel Kohlman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Drexel, Scott Gregory; Defendant: Moralesacosta, Saul; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Moralesacosta, Saul; Charge #: 001; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Drexel, Scott Gregory

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Egan, Gerad Denis