This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 15:34:40 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Samuel Vasquez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Samuel Vasquez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2355

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Vasquez, Samuel

 

Court Documents

Notice

07/18/2016: Notice

* Public *

07/07/2015: * Public *

Complaint

05/29/2015: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2016
  • FinancialVasquez, Samuel; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2016-02794; Vasquez, Samuel; $129.53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • FinancialVasquez, Samuel; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2016-02428; Vasquez, Samuel; $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • FinancialVasquez, Samuel; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2016-02105; Vasquez, Samuel; $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • FinancialVasquez, Samuel; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2016-01614; Vasquez, Samuel; $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • FinancialVasquez, Samuel; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2016-01352; Vasquez, Samuel; $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • FinancialVasquez, Samuel; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2016-00867; Vasquez, Samuel; $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FinancialVasquez, Samuel; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2016-00430; Vasquez, Samuel; $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • FinancialVasquez, Samuel; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2016-00047; Vasquez, Samuel; $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • FinancialVasquez, Samuel; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2015-03221; Vasquez, Samuel; $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMisdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Vasquez, Samuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Vasquez, Samuel; Charge #: 004; Description: VC21453(a): Red Signal-Vehicular Responsibilities; Statute: 21453(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Vasquez, Samuel; Charge #: 003; Description: VC22450(a): Failure To Stop At Stop Sign (TSE); Statute: 22450(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Vasquez, Samuel; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Vasquez, Samuel; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less