This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 18:03:09 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Roman Contreras, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Roman Contreras, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol, Hansen, Ronald and Krashna, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2823

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Hansen, Ronald

Krashna, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Contreras, Roman Christopher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorney

Lope, Armando

 

Court Documents

Collection Statement

08/31/2021: Collection Statement

Returned Mail

08/23/2021: Returned Mail

Collection Statement

08/06/2021: Collection Statement

Criminal: Minute Order

08/02/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/26/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/15/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

07/12/2021: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

07/12/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

07/08/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DispositionPrison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC2800.1: Evading an Officer in Vehicle; Prison; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 08/02/2021; Term: 1 Year; End Date: 08/01/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/02/2021; Fee Totals; $150.00; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC2800.1: Evading an Officer in Vehicle; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC2800.1: Evading an Officer in Vehicle; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialContreras, Roman Christopher; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDefense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketConviction Certified by Clerk of the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCharges and Direct Consequence of Plea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Contreras, Roman Christopher; Contract Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Contreras, Roman Christopher; Contract Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Krashna, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Krashna, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Contreras, Roman Christopher; Contract Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Krashna, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Contreras, Roman Christopher; Contract Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Contreras, Roman Christopher; Charge #: 001; Description: VC2800.1: Evading an Officer in Vehicle; Statute: 2800.1; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando